Financial history SMALL ACTS OF KINDNESS TRUST

Charity number: 1178546
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £133.21k £236.11k £218.64k £256.02k £288.02k
Total expenditure £136.71k £194.54k £225.32k £257.80k £278.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £49.97k N/A
Income from government grants £48.94k £124.77k £91.95k £49.97k £114.84k