MIDDLESBROUGH COMMUNITY CHURCH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
RELIGIOUS ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £884 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Middlesbrough
Governance
- 03 November 1981: Standard registration
- ST AIDANS COMMUNITY CHURCH (Working name)
- KINGDOM LIFE TRUST (Previous name)
- MIDDLESBOROUGH COMMUNITY CHURCH (Previous name)
- MIDDLESBOROUGH COMMUNITY CHURCH TRUST (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW WALKER | Chair | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Lois Huntington | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Chris Harte | Trustee | 24 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JAMIE JONES | Trustee | 16 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.59k | £92.28k | £71.30k | £96.53k | £117.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £99.71k | £89.51k | £93.12k | £84.79k | £112.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £880 | £3.64k | N/A | £571 | £884 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 28 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 February 2021 | 6 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 9 SEPTEMBER 1981 . NAME CHANGE BY RESOLUTION 2ND AUGUST 2009
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE COUNTY OF CLEVELAND AND ELSEWHERE BY ANY MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING THE PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE AND PRINCIPLES AND THE PASTORAL CARE OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE AND THE PRINTING AND DISTRIBUTION OF THE BIBLE AND CHRISTIAN LITERATURE. 2. THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
CLEVELAND AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Middlesbrough Community Church
St. Aidans Centre
Clifton Street
Middlesbrough
TS1 4BZ
- Phone:
- 01642249198
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window