Accounts and annual returns ZION CHRISTIAN CHURCH (BOYNE)

Charity number: 1179758
Charity reporting is up to date (223 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 08 February 2025 223 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 08 February 2025 223 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 26 July 2023 26 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 07 September 2023 69 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 August 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 16 August 2021 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 30 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 08 November 2020 131 days late Download Open in new window