ZION CHRISTIAN CHURCH (BOYNE)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preaching of the Word of God , Practice of Christianity There literature provided which deals with the teaching of Jesus Christ as the Lord our saviour The educational programs are more to do with teaching to children Sunday school on Biblical basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
230 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Rotherham
Governance
- 31 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liver Ndlovu | Trustee | 31 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
COSTER NKALA | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
XOLELANI MOYO | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAKANE MATAU | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
RABSON NDLOVU | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
KENERI MAMBANE | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr BER LEKGANYANE | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MANDLA MHAULE | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
NHLANHLA MOYO | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
EPHRAIM MAFETSA | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
NYALADZANI TSHUMA | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
SIMULANI SIMILO DUBE | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
MPUMELELO TSHUMA | Trustee | 31 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.67k | £1.59k | £193 | £995 | £4.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.27k | £717 | £0 | £990 | £1.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 February 2025 | 223 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 February 2025 | 223 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 July 2023 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 07 September 2023 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 August 2021 | 47 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 16 August 2021 | 47 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 08 November 2020 | 131 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, CHURCH SERVICES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF CHRISTIAN RELIGION PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND OUTREACH ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Arundel Avenue
Dalton
Rotherham
S65 4JY
- Phone:
- 07397565189
- Email:
- mkutsie@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window