THE BOREHAM WOOD COMMUNITY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote community participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for the playing of football and other sports capable of improving health. To provide and assist in providing facilities for sport, recreation or other leisure time occupation of persons who have need for such facilities by reason of their youth, age, infirmity or disablement or public at large.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 11 December 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DANIEL GEORGE HUNTER | Chair | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charlie Hunter | Trustee | 19 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas John Godsave | Trustee | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARK RICHARD DAWE | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.23k | £26.91k | £56.50k | £49.84k | £46.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.03k | £27.12k | £55.72k | £48.11k | £47.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 12 days | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 122 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 August 2024 | 122 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 31 May 2022 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 31 May 2022 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 April 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 31 May 2022 | 426 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, BOTH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE INHABITANTS OF HERTFORDSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS 3.1 TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS CAPABLE OF IMPROVING HEALTH (FACILITIES IN THIS ARTICLE 3 MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES); 3.2 TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR SPORT, RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF SUCH PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED FOR SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 3.3 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROMOTE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; 3.4 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND OTHER PERSONS INCLUDING ACADEMIC, SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL EDUCATION) THROUGH SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; AND 3.5 FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN EACH CASE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BOREHAMWOOD FOOTBALL CLUB
MEADOW PARK
BROUGHINGE ROAD
BOREHAMWOOD
WD6 5AL
- Phone:
- 07758253537
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window