SALEEM MEMORIAL TRUST UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organization/charity will provide financial support to Saleem Memorial Trust Hospital in Pakistan. The hospital will run primarily on donations and generous contributions from community. The hospital is being established in Lahore, Pakistan as a centre of excellence, providing state-of-the-art treatment. The hospital aims to offer quality medical services to all members of the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 01 August 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASGHAR ALI CHAUDHARY | Chair | 03 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mohammad Naseem Khan | Trustee | 03 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
IJAZ SHAFI | Trustee | 24 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHAHZAD SALEEM | Trustee | 24 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.02k | £3.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.15k | £610 | £636 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 May 2025 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 August 2024 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 June 2022 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED IS TO WORK FOR THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH BY ESTABLISHING, OPERATING, FUNDING AND SUPPORTING HEALTH CARE FACILITIES, ESTABLISHMENTS AND UNITS INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, HOSPITALS, CLINICS, LABORATORIES, RESEARCH FACILITIES, MEDICAL EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AND OTHER HEALTH FACILITIES UNDER ANY ARRANGEMENT. THE INSTITUTION(S) RUN UNDER THE COMPANY WILL PROVIDE RELIEF, CARE AND ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR AGE, FINANCIAL STANDING AND GEOGRAPHICAL LOCATION. IT WILL PROMOTE THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT BY SETTING UP AND SUPPORTING SALEEM MEMORIAL TRUST HOSPITAL IN LAHORE, PAKISTAN, A STATE OF THE ART MULTIPLE SPECIALTY HOSPITAL PROVIDING SUBSIDIZED TREATMENT TO INDIGENT PATIENTS. THE HEALTH CARE FACILITY WILL OFFER HIGH-TECH MEDICAL CARE WITH CUTTING EDGE MEDICAL EQUIPMENT AND A HIGHLY TRAINED MEDICAL TEAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Amex Associates
144-146 East Barnet Road
BARNET
Hertfordshire
EN4 8RD
- Phone:
- 02084167000
- Email:
- smtuk@smth.pk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window