Financial history ST JAMES'S ALNWICK UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY

Charity number: 1178326
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £68.24k £62.79k £78.68k £68.90k £108.63k
Total expenditure £68.74k £99.93k £91.38k £82.68k £112.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A