Financial history MEGAN HURLEY FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1179487
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 20/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £65.72k £23.98k £26.32k £31.86k £50.66k
Total expenditure £6.79k £16.28k £9.81k £11.30k £15.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A