Accounts and annual returns GIVING BACK CRAWLEY

Charity number: 1178136
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 05 March 2025 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 05 March 2025 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2023 23 October 2024 237 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 23 October 2024 237 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2022 15 March 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 15 March 2023 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 01 March 2022 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 01 March 2022 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 19 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 19 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window