Trustees CYMDEITHAS HANES TEULUOEDD POWYS/POWYS FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity Number: 511875

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
URSULA GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 08 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Harry Davies | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Catherine Phillips-Davies | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lloyd | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Caines | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEITH WILLIAMS | Trustee | 06 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER ANN LEWIS | Trustee | 11 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM JONES | Trustee | 11 October 2011 |
|
|||||
ANGELA VERITY JONES | Trustee | 11 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN RICHARD JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP GEOFFREY THOMAS BUFTON | Trustee |
|
||||||
HEATHER BUFTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.