BROADCAST TELEVISION TECHNOLOGY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1). To restore and preserve MCR21, a 1960s BBC television mobile control room. 2). To inform and educate the public, particularly young people, about the history of MCR21 and the broadcast technology used to construct television outside broadcast units in the 1960s.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 25 July 2018: CIO registration
- BTTT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIAN SUMMERS | Chair | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peakin | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Paul Robert Read | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Ellis Owen | Trustee | 11 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FRANK TRENOUTH | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RONALD NICHOLAS DASHWOOD GILBEY | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.32k | £45.51k | £5.57k | £18.55k | £4.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.68k | £44.36k | £18.68k | £30.84k | £2.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 02 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 01 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 08 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 25 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE TECHNOLOGIES, TECHNIQUES AND EQUIPMENT USED TO PRODUCE TELEVISION PROGRAMS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 1) THE PRESERVATION, RESTORATION AND EXHIBITION OF HISTORIC BROADCAST TELEVISION EQUIPMENT ALONG WITH ANY ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT, DOCUMENTATION, RECORDINGS AND IMAGES; (2) FACILITATING AND ENCOURAGING THE INTEREST OF THE PUBLIC AND THE STUDY AND APPRECIATION FOR EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES, PARTICULARLY OF YOUNG PEOPLE, IN THE TECHNOLOGY THAT HAS BEEN USED AND DEVELOPED, SINCE THE ADVENT OF TELEVISION, TO PRODUCE TELEVISION PROGRAMMES BY ELECTRONIC MEANS; (3) RECORDING AND DOCUMENTING THE DEVELOPMENT AND HISTORY OF TELEVISION TECHNOLOGY AND ITS ASSOCIATED EQUIPMENT AND THE MEMORIES OF THE PEOPLE WHO WORKED WITH IT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 PRIOR CROFT CLOSE
CAMBERLEY
GU15 1DE
- Phone:
- 01276677879
- Email:
- brian@mcr21.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window