LIVERPOOL CHINESE GOSPEL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity under the delegated supervision of the five committees organise and run regular (weekly) church services in Chinese (Cantonese and Mandarin) and English and an assortment of other largely Christian ministry activities that include meetings during the week for a variety of age, gender, language and training groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Liverpool City
Governance
- 19 September 2018: CIO registration
- 19 January 2022: Funds received from 1136312 LIVERPOOL CHINESE GOSPEL CHURCH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luk Yau Chan | Chair | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
TOMMY HO YIN KWAN | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr MAW JOO TAN | Trustee | 21 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rev DAVID SEIBOTH | Trustee | 15 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £503.70k | £142.27k | £166.30k | £191.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £164.60k | £146.53k | £148.46k | £163.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £138.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £12.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £786 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £352.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £164.60k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £625 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 14 September 2021 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 June 2021 | 343 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 27 August 2021 | 423 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 19 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
2.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN LIVERPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL BASIS HEREAFTER STATED. 2.2 TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP, POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN LIVERPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. 2.3 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN LIVERPOOL AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. 2.4 TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 GREAT GEORGE SQUARE
LIVERPOOL
L1 5DY
- Phone:
- 01517095050
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window