CARE FOR CLARE APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils at the Clare School, South park Avenue, Norwich NR4 7AU, and to relieve disability of pupils at that school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 02 July 2018: CIO registration
- 15 September 2021: Funds received from 1014963 CLARE SCHOOL SUPPORT CHARITY
- CLARE SCHOOL PROJECTS CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL MITCHELL | Chair | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wicks | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzanne Wakefield | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Cox | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|||||
GAVIN ARTHUR THORPE | Trustee | 02 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.06k | £4.43k | £7.95k | £17.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.34k | £3.96k | £216 | £22.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 02 JUL 2018 AMENDED ON 14 FEB 2020
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT THE CLARE SCHOOL SOUTH PARK AVENUE NORWICH NR4 7AU AND TO RELIEVE DISABILITY OF PUPILS AT THAT SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLARE SCHOOL
SOUTH PARK AVENUE
NORWICH
NR4 7AU
- Phone:
- 01603454782
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window