WOLVERTON EVANGELICAL CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wolverton Evangelical Church operates in Wolverton and provides Sunday morning and evening services to which everyone is welcome and we also provide meetings for; Parent and toddlers, primary-age children, youth group and seniors group. We also run a market stall in Wolverton.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 12 April 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROY MOFFATT | Chair | 02 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MUMFORD | Trustee | 02 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GOUGH | Trustee | 02 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD MARCH | Trustee | 02 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KINDRED | Trustee | 02 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.00k | £110.79k | £106.31k | £105.60k | £112.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.43k | £92.23k | £116.00k | £58.25k | £60.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 November 2020 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02 OCT 2011
Charitable objects
(1)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN[] AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND (2)SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF [THE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH IN GENERAL MEETING] [THE MANAGING TRUSTEES] FURTHER THE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
110 Windsor Street
Wolverton
MILTON KEYNES
MK12 5AT
- Phone:
- 07956011935
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window