NOTRE DAME REFUGEE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting people seeking asylum and those granted refugee status and their dependants through: Legal and other advice Relieving financial hardship Preserving and protecting physical and mental health Advancing education and training including language skills Educating the public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 April 2018: CIO registration
- 21 August 2019: Funds received from 1122110 NOTRE DAME REFUGEE CENTRE
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALESSANDRA RAJA | Chair | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
KATE DAVIS | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Zoe VERHASSELT LEONARD | Trustee | 21 June 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Fr Martin Mcananey | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
ELODIE BRIAN | Trustee | 29 September 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Elizabeth MILLAR | Trustee | 08 March 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Hubert Marie Bruno Bonnet-Eymard | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
REV Des HANRAHAN | Trustee | 22 June 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Alan Stephen Williams sm | Trustee | 17 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £308.65k | £430.52k | £379.52k | £415.66k | £394.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £308.04k | £313.02k | £384.25k | £399.78k | £374.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.40k | £11.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
A) ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RELIEVING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS PARTICULARLY BY THE PROVISION OF LEGAL AND OTHER ADVICE. B) RELIEVING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING (TEMPORARILY OR PERMANENTLY) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. C) PRESERVING AND PROTECTING THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS. D) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY. E) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM. F) RELIEVING SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR WHO ARE REFUGEES, AND WHO RESIDE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM. G) RELIEVING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE PROVISION OF FREE LEGAL ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE TO PERSONS WHO, THROUGH LACK OF MEANS, WOULD OTHERWISE BE UNABLE TO OBTAIN SUCH ADVICE; AND H) PROVIDING GENERAL EDUCATION INCLUDING LANGUAGE SKILLS TO ENABLE ACCESS TO THE WIDER COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NOTRE DAME REFUGEE CENTRE
5 LEICESTER PLACE
LONDON
WC2H 7BX
- Phone:
- 02074402642
- Email:
- info@notredamerc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window