HONG KONG WATCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of human rights in Hong Kong by: monitoring abuses, research into human rights issues and providing technical advice; publishing in-depth reports; raising awareness of, and promoting public support for, human rights issues; facilitating discussion and engagement with human rights in civil society; and international advocacy of human rights.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 20 September 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benedict Rogers | Trustee | 03 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Danielsen | Trustee | 26 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
GRAY DANIEL SERGEANT | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr MALTE PHILIPP KAEDING PHD | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
AILEEN YI WAN LAM | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.76k | £756.58k | £566.72k | £600.83k | £392.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.37k | £136.11k | £272.15k | £387.00k | £418.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £756.58k | £566.70k | £466.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £133.20k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | £18 | £1.35k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £115.78k | £241.84k | £354.07k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £20.33k | £30.31k | £32.93k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £1.44k | £1.44k | £1.44k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) IN HONG KONG BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: - MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; - OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF SUCH ABUSES; - RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; - PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO INTERNATIONAL GOVERNMENTS, INCLUDING THE UK GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS, ON HUMAN RIGHTS; - CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW BY OFFERING EXPERT ADVICE TO INTERNATIONAL GOVERNMENTS; - COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; - COMMENTING ON THE CAUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES, INCLUDING VIOLATIONS OF JUDICIAL INDEPENDENCE AND FREEDOM OF SPEECH IN ACADEMIA; - PUBLISHING AUTHORITATIVE REPORTS WHICH PROVIDE AN IN-DEPTH EXAMINATION OF POTENTIAL VIOLATIONS OF HUMAN RIGHTS; - PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; - INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS, MAKING RECOMMENDATIONS TO THE UNITED KINGDOM GOVERNMENT AND THE WIDER INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITY WHEN VIOLATIONS OF HUMAN RIGHTS IN HONG KONG TAKE PLACE; - FACILITATING DISCUSSION AND ENGAGEMENT WITH HUMAN RIGHTS IN HONG KONG AMONG KEY STAKEHOLDERS IN ACADEMIA, GOVERNMENT, PARLIAMENT, THE MEDIA, AND HONG KONG'S CIVIL SOCIETY; - RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; - ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT OBJECT BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO ENGAGE IN POLITICAL ACTIVITY PROVIDED THAT THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE PROPOSED ACTIVITIES WILL FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY TO AN EXTENT JUSTIFIED BY THE RESOURCES COMMITTED AND THE ACTIVITY IS NOT THE DOMINANT MEANS BY WHICH THE CHARITY CARRIED OUT ITS OBJECTS. THIS OBJECT WILL BE PURSUED PARTICULARLY FROM THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AT THE TRUSTEES' DISCRETION. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office 7
35-37 Ludgate Hill
London
EC4M 7JN
- Phone:
- 02074881867
- Email:
- info@hongkongwatch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window