GRAVITY HQ

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote social inclusion for the public benefit by preventing people from becoming socially excluded, relieving the need of those people who are socially excluded and assisting them to integrate into society through the provision of a social club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- West Sussex
Governance
- 24 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MUBBASAR HUSSAIN | Chair | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
GONCA GUL | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
HAMAD AKHTAR | Trustee | 24 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/11/2020 | 01/11/2021 | 01/11/2022 | 01/11/2023 | 01/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.40k | £2.85k | £2.91k | £5.01k | £7.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.52k | £1.35k | £11.35k | £9.33k | £9.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 November 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2021 | 11 October 2022 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 November 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 November 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 90 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 24 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A SOCIAL CLUB. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, LEARNING DISABILITIES, AUTISM OR MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 LARK RISE
CRAWLEY
RH11 7QQ
- Phone:
- 07877327567
- Email:
- mu786hussain@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window