Accounts and annual returns OLD SWINFORD HOSPITAL SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1178814
Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 31 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 26 March 2025 360 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2022 09 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Not Required
Annual return 13 July 2021 18 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 13 July 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 July 2020 Not Required