DIVERSE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Diverse Church fosters Christian communities across the United Kingdom that enable young LGBTQIA people to celebrate their identity and flourish in faith. These provide a safe space for LGBTQIA Christians to share their experience of their sexuality, to discuss the interrelation of their sexuality and Christian theology.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rachel Claire Kehoe | Chair | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Carol Jacqueline Dawson | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Harry Brooke | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alec Henry Tooms | Trustee | 06 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katie Jane Allen | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Verona Taylor-Blackford | Trustee | 15 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Angela Jade Irwin | Trustee | 21 January 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30k | £1.79k | £13.31k | £23.57k | £25.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.03k | £875 | £4.13k | £16.57k | £16.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON 03 AUG 2018 AMENDED ON 06 FEB 2023
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, AMONGST LESBIAN, GAY, BISEXUAL, TRANS, QUEER, QUESTIONING, INTERSEX AND ASEXUAL (LGBTQIA+) CHRISTIANS, AND HUMAN RIGHTS, THROUGH 1. THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY; 2. THE PROMOTION OF A PUBLIC SENTIMENT THAT WILL PUT AN END TO DISCRIMINATORY TREATMENT OF LGBTQIA+ CHRISTIANS; 3. THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL SUPPORT; 4. THE PROVISION OF THEOLOGICAL DISCUSSION; 5. AND OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT?
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Albert Drive
BELFAST
BT6 9JH
- Phone:
- 07896694548
- Email:
- hello@diversechurch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window