Accounts and annual returns BROMHEAD MEDICAL CHARITY

Charity number: 511893
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 26 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 22 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 14 March 2023 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2021 01 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 01 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 April 2020 26 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 26 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window