Governing document BROMHEAD MEDICAL CHARITY
Charity number: 511893

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 09/06/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/09/1981 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/12/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/11/2015
Charitable objects
TO PREVENT, RELIEVE AND CURE SICKNESS AND ILL HEALTH OF EVERY KIND (INCLUDING PHYSICAL INJURIES) AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF LINCOLNSHIRE AND NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
LINCOLNSHIRE AND NEIGHBOURING COUNTIES
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.