Trustees BROMHEAD MEDICAL CHARITY
Charity number: 511893

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Saywell | Chair | 22 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard John Thornton | Trustee | 03 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Rosa Wilson | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Gordon Forsyth | Trustee | 18 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bailey | Trustee | 19 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Jane Chard | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Patricia Frankish | Trustee | 15 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
EMYR MORRIS | Trustee | 29 September 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.