Accounts and annual returns UNLEASHING LIVES

Charity number: 1178459
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Annual return 05 April 2023 19 September 2024 227 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 19 September 2024 227 days late
Annual return 03 July 2022 30 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 July 2022 30 March 2023 On Time
Annual return 03 July 2021 18 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 July 2021 18 July 2021 On Time
Annual return 03 July 2020 17 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 03 July 2020 18 January 2021 On Time