Financial history HINDU TEMPLE SOCIETY BLACKPOOL

Charity number: 1179525
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £9.00k £1.00k £2.50k £2.90k £700
Total expenditure £1.50k £200 £301 £495 £600
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A