URBAN YOUTH INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Urban Youth Initiative provides activities for young people from deprived areas throughout the North Midlands and the North West. The charity uses sport, music and theatre to engage with hard to reach young people who could be at risk of youth crime, gang culture and child sexual exploitation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 19 July 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Shropshire
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 07 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
AKEEL AHMED | Chair | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY PAUL MUNT | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
GRAEME MORRIS | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 19/07/2020 | 19/07/2021 | 19/07/2022 | 19/07/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 19 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 July 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2022 | 19 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 July 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2021 | 18 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 19 July 2020 | 11 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 19 July 2020 | 12 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO HELP YOUNG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 8 AND 25, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY IN PARTICULAR THROUGH ENGAGEMENT IN THE ARTS AND CULTURE AND AMATEUR SPORT
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 RONALDSWAY DRIVE
NEWCASTLE
ST5 9HE
- Phone:
- 01782634784
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window