BUDE METHODIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bude Methodist Church offers opportunities and facilities for the public to take part in Christian Worship events, such as services, prayer meetings, singing and bible study. We also offer opportunities for fellowship with each other and to invite community members to social events, such as fundraising via coffee mornings, craft club, youth group, luncheon club and varied social opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

29 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
- Devon
Governance
- 21 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
29 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deacon Debbie Marsh | Chair | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Taylor | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
KEITH KENNARD | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jean Messenger MBE | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Bailey | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Glenice Shepherd | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Francis Burdett | Trustee | 13 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Knight | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gill Beasley | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Quinn | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
AnnE Butler | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Luxton | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Jane Burch | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Knight | Trustee | 25 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annette Cole | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Bridgette Whattler | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Petula Biddlecombe | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ward | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Mill | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Howard | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
George Jose | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gwyneth Chadd | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Riviere | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Overy | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Bond | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Penny Harris | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Short | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
ROY MICHAEL MACKENZIE FCA | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
|||||
MARK ROBERT WARD | Trustee | 05 March 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.60k | £109.64k | £96.03k | £107.84k | £156.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.89k | £111.52k | £78.31k | £83.26k | £121.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 11 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF UNION (1932) AND METHODIST CHURCH ACT (1976) ADOPTED 20 SEP 1932
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE METHODIST CHURCH ARE AND SHALL BE DEEMED TO HAVE BEEN SINCE THE DATE OF UNION THE ADVANCEMENT OF - (A) THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINAL STANDARDS AND THE DISCIPLINE OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (B) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CONNEXIONAL, DISTRICT, CIRCUIT, LOCAL OR OTHER ORGANISATION OF THE METHODIST CHURCH; (C) ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY SOCIETY OR INSTITUTION SUBSIDUARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH; (D) ANY PURPOSE FOR THE TIME BEING OF ANY CHARITY BEING A CHARITY SUBSIDIARY OR ANCILLARY TO THE METHODIST CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bude Methodist Church
Leven Road
Bude
Cornwall
EX23 8LA
- Phone:
- 01288355508
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window