PROJECT MAMA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Project MAMA is a peer support service launched in March 2018, offering antenatal, birth and postnatal support to women who are asylum seekers, refugees, and those with irregular immigration status. We believe that every woman has the right to give birth safely, make her own empowered, evidence based choices and receive the support she needs for a positive birth and early parenting experience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £14,924 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
Governance
- 19 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Gilmore | Chair | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ermioni Xanthopoulou | Trustee | 10 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Monique Lakhman | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Heeral Dave | Trustee | 08 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beth Benedict | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Angela Helen Conway | Trustee | 21 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.18k | £194.06k | £176.21k | £222.47k | £242.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.14k | £141.57k | £136.21k | £200.58k | £196.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £4.79k | £9.81k | £14.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED ON DATED 19 FEB 2019 AMENDED ON 02 DEC 2020
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF VULNERABLE WOMEN IN THE BRISTOL POSTCODE AREA PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MIGRANTS THROUGH PREGNANCY, LABOUR, CHILDBIRTH AND EARLY PARENTING BY PROVIDING ONE-TO-ONE SUPPORT, ADVOCACY, SPECIALIST INFORMATION, REFERRALS TO PARTNER AGENCIES AND PEER SUPPORT GROUPS AND OTHER RELEVANT ACTIVITIES AS MAY BE DETERMINED BY THE DIRECTORS. FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE, WE DEFINE ‘VULNERABLE WOMEN’ AS THOSE WITH UNSTABLE / INSECURE IMMIGRATION STATUS AND/OR BARRIERS TO HEALTHCARE, SURVIVORS OF SEXUAL ABUSE, GENDER BASED VIOLENCE, EXPLOITATION OR WITH POOR MENTAL HEALTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 16
Easton Business Centre
Felix Road
Bristol
BS5 0HE
- Phone:
- 0117 941 5320
- Email:
- hello@projectmama.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window