BILLINGHAM AND STOCKTON BOROUGH FOODBANK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foodbank collects food from various sources and issues food parcels to individuals and families in crisis, in the Stockton Borough. Partner agencies decide on need and issue vouchers. Staff and volunteers give advice and signpost clients to help address their underlying needs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
70 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 03 April 2018: CIO registration
- 09 January 2019: Funds received from 252020 MORPETH'S CHARITY
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Allan OBoyle | Trustee | 18 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Andrew Pearce | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Radcliffe | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY BURTON | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.53k | £235.15k | £123.56k | £107.30k | £146.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.66k | £90.04k | £94.57k | £90.64k | £129.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.00k | £15.00k | £3.00k | £5.00k | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY WITHIN THE STOCKTON BOROUGH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE SUPPLY OF FOOD AND ANY OTHER PROVISION THAT HELPS ALLEVIATE AND REDUCE POVERTY AND HARDSHIP
Contact information
- Address:
-
BillinghamStocktonBorough Foodbank
4-6 West Precinct
BILLINGHAM
Cleveland
TS23 2NH
- Phone:
- 07583575522
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window