LIGHTHOUSE PRINCES RISBOROUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A non-residential week long holiday club for children run by Christians from local churches. Children are welcome from age 5 to 11. Lighthouse is run by volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £1,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 26 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH CHARLOTTE TINSLEY | Chair | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Eleyna Esme Christa Kibble | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Ryan Luke Romano | Trustee | 20 April 2022 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT JAMES CARTER | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev DAVID GARETH WILLIAMS | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.93k | £8.87k | £3.83k | £21.80k | £32.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.30k | £3.37k | £3.71k | £36.32k | £28.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.44k | £600 | N/A | N/A | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 09 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 February 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PRIMARILY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN ANNUAL HOLIDAY WEEK FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE AREA OF PRINCES RISBOROUGH, WITH ACTIVITIES IN A COMBINATION OF PERFORMING ARTS, TEACHING, MUSIC, AND HANDICRAFTS DELIVERED IN WAYS WHICH ADVANCE UNDERSTANDING OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND ITS VALUES
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Mary's Church Parish Office
Church Street
Princes Risborough
Bucks
HP27 9AN
- Phone:
- 01844275192
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window