Trustees ACTIVE OXFORDSHIRE
Charity number: 1179040

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Longworth | Chair | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kenny Shek | Trustee | 20 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Donna Husband | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Claire Ferens | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Nathan Matthews-Tree | Trustee | 18 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carl Davis | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Messenger | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Magill | Trustee | 15 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Hamp | Trustee | 31 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dean Woodman | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Pearce Higgins | Trustee | 12 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.