FRIENDS OF CHRIST CHURCH JUNIOR SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the pupils of the school by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities for education at Christ Church CofE VC Junior School in Downend (Bristol) by engaging in activities which support the school, support the school through the provision of facilities and equipment and develop effective relationships between staff, parents and other stakeholders.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 11 July 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katie Leaver | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jodie Godfrey | Trustee | 07 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Brindle | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.02k | £4.45k | £10.54k | £2.13k | £2.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.04k | £1.40k | £18.81k | £2.89k | £503 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 12 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JUL 2018 as amended on 09 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL, AND TO FURTHER THESE OBJECTS THE FRIENDS OF CHRIST CHURCH JUNIOR SCHOOL MAY: ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND BENEFIT THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT SUPPORT THE SCHOOL THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT WHICH BENEFIT THE EDUCATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE CHILDREN DEVELOP EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF AND PARENTS AS WELL AS OTHER STAKEHOLDERS INVOLVED IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christchurch Junior School
Pendennis Road
BRISTOL
BS16 5JJ
- Phone:
- 01454866516
- Email:
- friendsofccj@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window