THE CLOCKWORK CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of the young people suffering from mental health in Oxted, Surrey and surrounding district by the relief of financial hardship, by the provision of financial assistance so that they can access counselling and other mental health services and the preservation and protection of good physical and mental health, such as peer support listening to such people in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 February 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MATTHEW JAMES HAYES | Chair | 07 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Dawn Doughty | Trustee | 12 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Green | Trustee | 28 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN CHARLES SUNDT | Trustee | 27 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.52k | £20.16k | £31.78k | £22.66k | £64.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.65k | £8.05k | £25.45k | £27.67k | £55.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 12 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Feb 2019
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THE YOUNG PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH IN OXTED, SURREY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT BY: 1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE SO THAT THEY CAN ACCESS COUNSELLING AND OTHER MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES 2. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH SUCH AS PEER SUPPORT LISTENING TO SUCH PEOPLE IN NEED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Field Court
OXTED
Surrey
RH8 0PD
- Phone:
- 07958343233
- Email:
- enquiries@clockwork.org.uk
- Website:
-
clockwork.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window