Financial history RAITHBY VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 511916
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.63k £14.14k £17.38k £4.13k £4.41k
Total expenditure £6.83k £2.83k £9.74k £9.04k £5.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.67k £16.34k N/A N/A