UNDER THE STARS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Under the Stars is an arts and events charity for people with learning disabilities. We believe in their talent. We believe in their creativity. We believe in them. Through our workshops and events, we work with our learners to unlock their potential and change lives. We deliver Music, Dance and Drama workshops in Sheffield, and put on a proper nightclubs for people with learning disabilities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 18 July 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Smith | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sally Hinchcliffe | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SIOBHAN BRENNAN | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Shipway | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cath Annabel | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caryl Jean Carson Thomas | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £284.25k | £294.78k | £300.24k | £329.14k | £399.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £258.03k | £237.87k | £273.24k | £324.10k | £383.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £9.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ELSEWHERE (AND IN PARTICULAR INHABITANTS WITH DISABILITIES) BY BRINGING TOGETHER STATUTORY, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND SUCH INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF DISABILITY AND IN PARTICULAR LEARNING DISABILITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNDER THE STARS
57 BURTON STREET
SHEFFIELD
S6 2HH
- Phone:
- 01142331869
- Email:
- contact@underthestars.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window