Financial history GURUNANAK GURUDWARA (SIKH TEMPLE)

Charity number: 511918
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £82.80k £81.96k £92.54k £123.77k £140.06k
Total expenditure £92.35k £87.17k £81.71k £65.82k £58.93k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A