THE BARRY ELLIS AWARD FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training, helping Children/Young People and making grants to organisations (schools/charities etc.)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 15 October 1981: Standard registration
- 16 September 2015: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166 | £166 | £166 | £83 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £166 | £166 | £166 | £83 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 20 October 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 20 October 2014 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 17 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLATION OF TRUST DATED 16 SEPTEMBER 1981, AS AMENDED ON 27 APRIL 2001 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
THE ANNUAL AWARD OF A PRIZE TO A PUPIL OR PUPILS AT CODSALL HIGH SCOOL WHO HAVE SHOWN ONE OR MORE OF THE QUALITIES DEMONSTRATED BY BARRY ELLIS SUCH AS FAITH, COURAGE, DETERMINATION, CONCERN FOR OTHERS OR WHO HAVE PERFORMED TO THE BEST OF THEIR ABILITY WHILST AT SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window