INTERSTICIA UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity supports emerging leaders through scholarships, bursaries and leadership development. It also holds public educational events aimed to develop digital literacy and leadership skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANN ELIZABETH ROWLAND-CAMPBELL | Chair | 02 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Grace Rowland Campbell | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Louise Jacqueline Sibley | Trustee | 10 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Berivan Esen | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
TRISTAN MARK LUMLEY | Trustee | 02 February 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 28/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.53k | £15.95k | £36.98k | £28.41k | £74.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.02k | £22.42k | £46.62k | £40.13k | £73.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 31 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: (A) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND FUNDING FOR THE BENEFIT OF EMERGING LEADERS IN THEIR CHOSEN FIELDS OF EXPERTISE, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR GRANTS AND SCHOLARSHIPS FOR THEIR TUITION COSTS AND/OR THEIR LIVING COSTS; (B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR EMERGING LEADERS TO EXPERIENCE AND DEVELOP LEADERSHIP SKILLS IN THE INTERSTICE BETWEEN TECHNOLOGY, CULTURE AND SOCIETY BY CREATING LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ACCESS TO DIGITAL RESOURCES, CONFERENCES, RETREATS AND WORKSHOPS; (C) PROMOTING THE DEVELOPMENT OF DIGITAL LITERACY AND LEADERSHIP SKILLS, INCLUDING THROUGH PUBLIC EVENTS SUCH AS CONFERENCES AND WORKSHOPS. ‘EMERGING LEADERS’ MEANS INDIVIDUALS AGED 18 – 40 WITH LEADERSHIP EXPERIENCE OR AN AMBITION TO GAIN EXPERIENCE IN LEADERSHIP, INCLUDING WITHOUT LIMITATION POSTGRADUATE STUDENTS ATTENDING UNIVERSITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
INTERSTICIA UK
C/O 10 QUEEN STREET PLACE
LONDON
EC4R 1BE
- Phone:
- 0061413626737
- Email:
- info@intersticia.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window