THE ANKOMA DREAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to advance education of pupils at schools in Ankoma, Ghana and England, by supporting children from Ankoma to visit England on an educational and cultural trip. This brings children from both cultures together to create educational and cultural bonds, linking schools, teachers and pupils in a spirit of sharing and educational learning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- West Sussex
- Ghana
Governance
- 18 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ASHA RICHARDSON Mrs | Chair | 28 March 2017 |
|
|||||
Emma Capstick | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Elizabeth Henderson-Sykes | Trustee | 02 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
CRAIG RICHARDSON | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|||||
ANTHEA ROSE JANE BOWMAN | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JULIE LENIHAN | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
AUSTIN STUART BYE | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
ASHA MARIE RICHARDSON | Trustee | 28 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.12k | £1.87k | £4.10k | £1.91k | £3.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.34k | £0 | £0 | £235 | £10.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MAR 2017 AS AMENDED ON 27 DEC 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS AT SCHOOLS IN ANKOMA, GHANA AND ENGLAND BY: A) PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR CHILDREN FROM ANKOMA, GHANA TO TAKE PART IN A TRIP TO ENGLAND DESIGNED TO PROVIDE THEM WITH EDUCATIONAL AND DEVELOPMENTAL OPPORTUNITIES ON THEIR RETURN TO GHANA; B) ENABLING CHILDREN FROM GHANA AND ENGLAND TO PARTICIPATE IN JOINT LEARNING ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF BOTH GROUPS OF CHILDREN, C) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF AND PUPILS IN HOST SCHOOLS IN ENGLAND AND THE VISITING CHILDREN FROM GHANA DESIGNED TO ENABLE CONTINUED JOINT EDUCATIONAL ENGAGEMENT OPPORTUNITIES. 2) TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND HELP YOUNG PEOPLE IN ANKOMA, GHANA THROUGH: A) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B) PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Chester Cottage
Warcop
APPLEBY-IN-WESTMORLAND
Cumbria
CA16 6PD
- Phone:
- 07525746130
- Email:
- theankomadream@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window