HUNTINGDON & PETERBOROUGH FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES (CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main purposes of the WI organisation are to advance the education of women and girls for the public benefit - to promote sustainable development - to advance health - to advance citizenship by promotion of civic responsibility and volunteering. The WI seeks to give women the opportunity of working together in their communities and developing their capacity and skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
- Peterborough City
Governance
- HPFWI (CIO) (Working name)
- HUNTINGDON & PETERBOROUGH FEDERATION OF WIS (CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION) (Working name)
- HUNTINGDON & PETERBOROUGH FEDERATION OF WIS (CIO) (Working name)
- HUNTINGDON AND PETERBOROUGH FEDERATION OF WIS (CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION) (Working name)
- HUNTINGDON AND PETERBOROUGH FEDERATION OF WIS (CIO) (Working name)
- HUNTINGDON & PETERBOROUGH FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES CIO (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHYLLIS ELLA BROOKS | Chair | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judy Mary Shrewsbury | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Victoria Spencer | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARIA KATHYRN PIDOUX | Trustee | 17 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JEAN FRANCIS JEFFRIES | Trustee | 11 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
KAREN FRANCESCA ROWENA PRESTAGE | Trustee | 23 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.14k | £66.56k | £62.12k | £77.51k | £79.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.13k | £56.03k | £58.58k | £79.04k | £95.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £18.71k | £2.67k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 22 November 2021 | 53 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 44 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 23 APR 2018 AMENDED ON 14 APR 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FEDERATION ARE TO FURTHER THE PURPOSES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE MOVEMENT IN HUNTINGDON, PETERBOROUGH, ST IVES, ST NEOTS, RAMSEY, KIMBOLTON, NORTHBOROUGH AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6A WALDEN ROAD
HUNTINGDON
PE29 3AZ
- Phone:
- 01480453137
- Email:
- office@hpfwi.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window