ASSOCIATION OF SPECIAL CONSTABULARY OFFICERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Association of Special Constabulary Officers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £12,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Guernsey
- Isle Of Man
- Scotland
Governance
- 17 September 2018: CIO registration
- ASCCO (Working name)
- ASCO (Working name)
- ASSOCIATION OF SPECIAL CONSTABULARY CHIEF OFFICERS (OLD NAME) (Working name)
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Curtis-James Marshall | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|||||
Matthew Whalley | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jamie William Allan | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philip Charles Clare | Trustee | 08 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ashley Jean Frayling | Trustee | 13 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID PEDRICK-FRIEND | Trustee | 19 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.95k | £24.69k | £10.18k | £18.86k | £14.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.84k | £11.71k | £15.80k | £21.76k | £19.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.69k | N/A | £12.00k | £12.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 March 2024 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 March 2024 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 17 Sep 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE (1) THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY OF THE POLICE BY, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, PROVIDING AND FACILITATING THE GIVING OF INFORMATION, ADVICE, AND TRAINING TO SPECIAL CONSTABLES; AND (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF VOLUNTEERING AND PUBLIC PARTICIPATION IN THE PREVENTION AND SOLUTION OF CRIME FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ENGLAND, SCOTLAND, AND WALES, THE ISLE OF MAN, GUERNSEY AND ANY OTHER BRITISH OVERSEAS TERRITORY OR CROWN DEPENDENCY WHO MAY, FROM TIME TO TIME, EMPLOY SPECIAL CONSTABLES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Enterprise Centre
University Drive
Norwich
NR4 7TJ
- Phone:
- 02045511214
- Email:
- SECRETARY@ASCO.POLICE.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.