Financial history OFFCHURCH VILLAGE HALL FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 511934
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £16.94k £15.46k £5.64k £20.51k £9.38k
Total expenditure £9.23k £9.94k £6.44k £7.36k £14.28k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £420 N/A