THE TOY APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We receive money donations via our just giving website, gifts via toy drop centres. We raise awareness via media, TV and our web site. We run toy sort days where volunteers sort and categorise the toys into type and age group. We work with social workers, drop in centres and schools to identify children in need of our help. In December we make up and distribute toy sacks in time for Christmas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bolton
- Bury
- Cheshire East
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Wigan
Governance
- 05 July 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DEE DRAKE | Chair | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Kinder | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER JOHN DRAKE | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE TANN YEATES | Trustee | 01 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £140.12k | £184.86k | £166.40k | £262.54k | £258.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.23k | £68.92k | £145.17k | £166.67k | £335.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 12 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF NEED OF PEOPLE WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY,?NANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, IN GREATER MANCHESTER, CHESHIRE AND LANCASHIRE, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF: I) TOYS AND BOOKS TO CHILDREN AGED 0-17 WHO WOULD NOT OTHERWISE RECEIVE THEM. II) ESSENTIAL PRODUCTS SUCH AS TOOTHPASTE, SOAP, SANITARY TOWELS AND BLANKETS TO FAMILIES IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Thornfield Cottage
Twemlow Green
Holmes Chapel
CREWE
CW4 8BJ
- Phone:
- 01477533481
- Email:
- thetoyappeal@gmail.com
- Website:
-
thetoyappeal.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window