REJOICE RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting and publicising the Christian Faith though community get together, concerts, conferences, music, Outreaches of prayer and evangelism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 July 2018: CIO registration
- RRC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MICHAEL OLUWASEGUN FAPOJUWO | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
TOBECHUKWU NATALIE WEMAMBU | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHUKWUKA EMMANUEL ENEMOKWU | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.03k | £959 | £75 | £50 | £955 | |
|
Total expenditure | £230 | £940 | £150 | £150 | £150 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 February 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 31 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, PUBLICISING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURES ON THE CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
112 ONSLOW ROAD
CROYDON
CR0 3NL
- Phone:
- 07951538709
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window