Financial history THE GREAT NORTH WOOD COLLECTIVE

Charity number: 1178671
Charity reporting is up to date (270 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £39.89k £80.76k £79.01k £135.42k £19.06k
Total expenditure £38.32k £71.22k £83.42k £124.19k £23.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £9.96k £11.51k £20.35k £72.45k £15.40k