TRI-ANGLIA TRIATHLON CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in Norfolk and Suffolk, in particular; the provision of events, coaching and training, in the three sports of Triathlon (Swimming, Cycling and Running).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
- Suffolk
Governance
- 03 April 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cam Heath | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Caroline White | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew White | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Andrew Crawford | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £147.45k | £33.72k | £65.78k | £96.27k | £114.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £125.35k | £30.67k | £50.60k | £96.04k | £111.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 26 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 26 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 18 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 03 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN NORFOLK AND SUFFOLK, IN PARTICULAR; THE PROVISION OF EVENTS, COACHING AND TRAINING, IN THE THREE SPORTS OF TRIATHLON (SWIMMING, CYCLING AND RUNNING).
Contact information
- Address:
-
64 Rowan Drive
Dereham
NR20 3TY
- Phone:
- 07825347975
- Email:
- secretary@tri-anglia.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window