Financial history GLAMORGAN BIRD CLUB

Charity number: 1177991
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £27.43k £6.15k £4.77k £5.64k £9.65k
Total expenditure £25.35k £4.35k £5.25k £8.93k £3.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A