SMILEYARK KIDS

Charity number: 1180233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance and provide facilities for education, training, social welfare, recreation and other leisure time activities with the object of improving the conditions and quality of life of children and families in the London borough of Bexley and surrounding areas. The organisation carry out its purposes by offering Breakfast, After School and Holiday Club facilities for children aged 4-11 years.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £213,107
Total expenditure: £193,905

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bexley
  • Greenwich

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 October 2018: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Taiye Georgina Salami Chair 25 September 2023
None on record
SUSAN OLUSOLA IKPEFURAN Trustee 10 July 2019
None on record
OMOTAYO ABOSEDE OSHOKO Trustee 08 October 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £154.10k £114.73k £280.40k £240.58k £213.11k
Total expenditure £141.89k £121.07k £208.32k £207.16k £193.91k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £4.19k £203.28k £112.69k £54.14k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 29 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 17 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 17 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
29 CAMERON DRIVE
DARTFORD
DA1 5GN
Phone:
07956263531