SMALL STEPS FOR AFRICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work for the advancement of the education and health of young people in Madagascar, that will enable them to gain skills leading to employment opportunities. We raise funds through child sponsorship programmes and deliver support through local partners. Projects could include pre and post school clubs, canteen programmes, school libraries, sanitation, and medical care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Madagascar
Governance
- 14 January 2019: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PRUDENCE ELIZABETH BAKER | Chair | 06 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Short | Trustee | 15 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY JANE BAKER | Trustee | 06 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
CHARLOTTE LOUISE BAKER M.A. | Trustee | 06 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
RORY DILWORTH | Trustee | 06 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
HELEN PYE M.A. | Trustee | 06 August 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.04k | £20.41k | £18.84k | £22.36k | £27.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.41k | £19.90k | £17.85k | £21.51k | £7.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 November 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 06 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
* FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN SUB-SAHARAN AFRICA, INITIALLY IN MADAGASCAR, IN ORDER TO ENABLE YOUNG PEOPLE TO GAIN SKILLS THAT LEAD TO EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES. * FOR THE PROMOTION OF HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THOSE LIVING IN SUB-SHARAN AFRICA, INITIALLY IN MADAGASCAR. * THESE OBJECTS WILL BE ACHIEVED BY WORKING WITH LOCAL PARTNERS (INDIVIDUALS OR OTHER SMALL NGOS) TO IDENTIFY AND FUND SUITABLE PROJECTS, TO PARTICULARLY BENEFIT THOSE WHO CURRENTLY DON'T HAVE ACCESS TO EDUCATION, CLEAN WATER OR MEDICAL FACILITIES. * THESE PROJECTS COULD INCLUDE, BUT ARE NOT LIMITED TO,: CHILD SPONSORSHIP PROGRAMMES, THE CONSTRUCTION OF CLEAN WATER/SANITATION FACILITIES, THE FUNDING OF MEDICAL CARE OR RELIEF.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 RAVENSCOURT ROAD
LYMINGTON
SO41 3PJ
- Phone:
- 07904460181
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window