Accounts and annual returns THE CROSSLANE FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1179854

Charity reporting is overdue by 861 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 27 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 130 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 130 days | |
Annual return | 27 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 496 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 496 days | |
Annual return | 27 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 861 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 861 days | |
Annual return | 27 February 2021 | 29 December 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 27 February 2021 | 29 December 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window