Accounts and annual returns RAYAAN BROWN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1178360
Charity reporting is up to date (7 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 February 2025 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 February 2025 7 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 September 2024 221 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 08 September 2024 221 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 April 2023 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 April 2023 71 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 March 2022 46 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 18 March 2022 46 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 27 March 2021 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 27 March 2021 55 days late Download Open in new window